This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 05/03/2020 at 19:05:22 (UTC).

CHARLES SCARPULLA - v. - INSERRA SUPERMARKETS, INC-DBA et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 CHARLES SCARPULLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INSERRA SUPERMARKETS, INC-DBA. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Scarpulla

Defendants

SHOPRITE OF WEST NYACK

OSTER RETAIL, LLC.

INSERRA SUPERMARKETS, INC-DBA

SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORTELLI, TERRENCE JAMES

Attorney at StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.

Defendant Attorney

ZIEGLER, PHILIP H

Attorney at Fishman McIntyre Berkeley Levine & Samansky PC

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

BILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Adj from 1/17/20 TO 1/21/20

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Adj from 1/17/20 TO 1/21/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) 3101(d) EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE - BART RODI, P.E.

PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) 3101(d) EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE - BART RODI, P.E.; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 07/03/2018; Received: 07/03/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 07/03/2018; Received: 07/03/2018

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Adj from 1/17/20 TO 1/21/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) 3101(d) EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE - BART RODI, P.E.; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: POST SITE INSPECTION DEMANDS; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Ziegler, P.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 07/03/2018; Received: 07/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 07/03/2018; Received: 07/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less