Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 01:25:46 (UTC).

CHARLES BARBA JR. - v. - JOHN J. DeCICCO DPM et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 CHARLES BARBA JR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JOHN J DeCICCO DPM. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Barba JR.

Defendants

John J. Decicco DPM

JOHN J. DeCICCO, DPM, PC

Steven Login MS, PT

PROACTIVE PHYSICAL THERAPY AND WELLNESS, PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHULMAN, JOSHUA A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOSHUA SCHULMAN, LLC

SCHULMAN, JOSHUA ADAM

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOSHUA A. SCHULMAN, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

Henderson, Lauren A

Attorney at Helwig Henderson, Gray & Spinola

KATZ, TRACY SOMBER

Attorney at Furman Kornfeld & Brennan LLP

LUNDMAN, JENNIE MARIE

Attorney at Furman Kornfeld & Brennan LLP

KORNFELD, NEIL STUART

Attorney at FURMAN KORNFELD & BRENNAN LLP

MARTIN, ROBERT D

Attorney at Law oOffice of Michael C. Tromello

CORKER, WILLIAM RUSSELL

Attorney at Law Office of W. Russell Corker, P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Letter & Proof of Service Included

ORDER - DISCHARGE ATTORNEY

--none--

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

Consent to Change Attorney

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Law Office of Russell Corker PC

EXHIBIT(S)

note of issue

EXHIBIT(S)

BP

EXHIBIT(S)

Answers

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

AFFIRMATION

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Letter & Proof of Service Included; Filed By: Schulman, J.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCHARGE ATTORNEY (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: Kornfeld, N.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Law Office of Russell Corker PC; Filed By: Schulman, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) note of issue; Filed By: Henderson, L.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) BP; Filed By: Henderson, L.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Answers; Filed By: Henderson, L.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Henderson, L.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Henderson, L.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affirmation of Service of Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Schulman, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Extension time to answer; Filed By: Corker, W.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Schulman, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Schulman, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Henderson, L.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Henderson, L.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schulman, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Schulman, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Schulman, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schulman, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Schulman, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less