This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:01:01 (UTC).

Chantee Harriotte v. Eda Mundija et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Chantee Harriotte filed an Other lawsuit against Eda Mundija. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John R Higgitt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John R Higgitt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chantee Harriotte

Defendants

Eda Mundija

Florian Brulaj

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEWMAN, JAMES

Attorney at JAMES NEWMAN ESQ

Defendant Attorney

GONZALES, ROSELLEN

Attorney at The Law Office of John Trop

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry re decision 1.17.20

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry re decision 1.17.20; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

ORDER - VACATING NOTE OF ISSUE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & STIPULATION SO ORDERED DATED 01/17/2020

ORDER - VACATING NOTE OF ISSUE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & STIPULATION SO ORDERED DATED 01/17/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K. (Motion #001) Excerpts from Defendants Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - K. (Motion #001) Excerpts from Defendants Affirmation; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Medical authorization Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Medical authorization Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Response to Post EBT demands

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Response to Post EBT demands; Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 9/6/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 9/6/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 5/24/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 5/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 03/22/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 03/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for VBOP and Discovery

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for VBOP and Discovery; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry re decision 1.17.20; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - VACATING NOTE OF ISSUE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & STIPULATION SO ORDERED DATED 01/17/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K. (Motion #001) Excerpts from Defendants Affirmation; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Medical authorization Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Response to Post EBT demands; Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 9/6/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 5/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 03/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for VBOP and Discovery; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Gonzales, R. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less