This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:23:44 (UTC).

CHANCY D. BOONE - v. - JAMES SHARPELLETTI et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 CHANCY D BOONE filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES SHARPELLETTI. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chancy D. Boone

Defendants

James Sharpelletti

James R. Sharpelletti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAPETOLA, JOSEPH J.

Attorney at CELLINO & BARNES, PC

Defendant Attorney

GAVIN, CHRISTOPHER MARTIN

Attorney at GENTILE & TAMBASCO

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gavin, C. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gavin, C. - filed by Russo, Apoznanski and Tambasco; Filed: 06/19/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Capetola, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Capetola, J.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Gavin, C. - filed by Russo, Apoznanski and Tambasco; Filed: 06/19/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Gavin, C. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Capetola, J.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gavin, C. - filed by Russo, Apoznanski and Tambasco; Filed: 06/19/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Gavin, C. - filed by Russo, Apoznanski and Tambasco; Filed: 06/19/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Capetola, J.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Capetola, J.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gavin, C. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Gavin, C. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Capetola, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less