This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 18:17:07 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC - v. - SARA ARMSTRONG

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SARA ARMSTRONG. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0105

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Sara Armstrong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEERIN, JOHN J

Attorney at MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

FLYNN, GERALD W

Attorney at GERALD W. FLYNN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) *Corrected*; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADMINSTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADMINSTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SARA ARMSTRONG

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SARA ARMSTRONG; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SARA ARMSTRONG

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SARA ARMSTRONG; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) *Corrected*; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADMINSTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SARA ARMSTRONG; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SARA ARMSTRONG; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less