This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 17:49:19 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC v. ROBERT D KILDARE

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERT D KILDARE. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1329

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Robert D Kildare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARASZEWSKI, DARLEEN VERONICA

Attorney at Mandarich Law Group, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redaction Cover Page

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redaction Cover Page; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Additional Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

20 DAY LETTER

20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redaction Cover Page; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less