This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 20:33:54 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC - v. - lorena Sanchezestrella

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against lorena Sanchezestrella. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Lorena Sanchezestrella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANGLOIS, CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at Girvin and Ferlazzo P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Langlois, C.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less