Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 23:24:31 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC v. CARL BARCOMB

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARL BARCOMB. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0086

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Carl Barcomb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARASZEWSKI, DARLEEN VERONICA

Attorney at Mandarich Law Group, LLP

Defendant Attorney

VanZyverden, William

Attorney at Hemming & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

ANSWER Answer and Affirmative Defenses

ANSWER Answer and Affirmative Defenses; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer and Affirmative Defenses; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less