This case was last updated from Ontario County Courts on 11/21/2021 at 04:49:24 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC et al v. Lisa A Ivers

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Cavalry SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lisa A Ivers. This case was filed in Ontario County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick G Reed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ontario, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frederick G Reed

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry SPV I LLC

Citibank NA

Defendant

Lisa A Ivers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, HEATHER ANN

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/10/2021; Received: 03/10/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Lisa A Ivers

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Lisa A Ivers; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/10/2021; Received: 03/10/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mail Service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mail Service; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 11/03/2021; Received: 11/03/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Redaction Cover Page

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Redaction Cover Page; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affirmation of Additional Mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affirmation of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit/Affirmation of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit/Affirmation of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit of Fact and Original Creditor Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit of Fact and Original Creditor Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Non-Military Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Non-Military Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

RJI -RE: OTHER Request for Judicial Intervention for Notice of Motion, Notice of Motion

RJI -RE: OTHER Request for Judicial Intervention for Notice of Motion, Notice of Motion; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/21/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mail Service; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 11/03/2021; Received: 11/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Redaction Cover Page; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affirmation of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit/Affirmation of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit of Fact and Original Creditor Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Non-Military Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Request for Judicial Intervention for Notice of Motion, Notice of Motion; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by Mandarich Law Group; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/10/2021; Received: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Lisa A Ivers; Filed By: Johnson, H. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/10/2021; Received: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less