This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 02:37:34 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK et al v. KATHERINE ROHRER

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KATHERINE ROHRER. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0411

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Essex County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S Y N C H R O N Y BANK

CAVALRY S P V I L L C ASSIGNEE

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

Katherine Rohrer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARASZEWSKI, DARLEEN VERONICA

Attorney at Mandarich Law Group, LLP

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT KATHERINE ROHRER

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT KATHERINE ROHRER; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT KATHERINE ROHRER; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less