This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 13:03:07 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY CAPITAL BANK et al v. LEO J SPRAGUE

Case Summary

On 08/18/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY CAPITAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEO J SPRAGUE. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0412

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Essex County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY CAPITAL BANK

COMENITY CAPITAL BANK

CAVALRY S P V I L L C ASSIGNEE

Defendant

Leo J Sprague

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWSIANY, GRZEGORZ

Attorney at Schachter Portnoy, L.L.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFF OF NON-MIL

AFFIDAVIT AFF OF NON-MIL; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY DEBT BUYER

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY DEBT BUYER; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LEO J SPRAGUE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LEO J SPRAGUE; Filed By: Owsiany, G. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/07/2019; Received: 09/07/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Owsiany, G. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/18/2019; Received: 08/18/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Owsiany, G. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/18/2019; Received: 08/18/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFF OF NON-MIL; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY DEBT BUYER; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LEO J SPRAGUE; Filed By: Owsiany, G. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/07/2019; Received: 09/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Owsiany, G. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/18/2019; Received: 08/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Owsiany, G. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/18/2019; Received: 08/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less