This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 21:07:57 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. v. JOIE L NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOIE L NGUYEN. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0029

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

Joie L Nguyen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FAYE, CRAIG

Attorney at SCHACHTER PORTNOY LLC

OWSIANY, GRZEGORZ

Attorney at Schachter Portnoy, L.L.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT CORRESPONDENCE

AFFIDAVIT CORRESPONDENCE; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFF OF NON-MIL

AFFIDAVIT AFF OF NON-MIL; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT; Filed By: Faye, C.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/11/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/11/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT CORRESPONDENCE; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFF OF NON-MIL; Filed By: Owsiany, G.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) JUDG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT; Filed By: Faye, C.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/11/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/11/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less