Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 15:54:46 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. v. ELLEN B POPELSKY

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELLEN B POPELSKY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

Ellen B Popelsky

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARASZEWSKI, DARLEEN VERONICA

Attorney at Mandarich Law Group, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REJECTION

NOTICE OF REJECTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT Redaction Cover Page

AFFIDAVIT Redaction Cover Page; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affirmation; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Mailing of Additional Notice

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Mailing of Additional Notice; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT ELLEN B POPELSKY

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT ELLEN B POPELSKY; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Redaction Cover Page; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affirmation; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Mailing of Additional Notice; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT ELLEN B POPELSKY; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less