This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 19:11:59 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. v. CASEY M ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASEY M ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0071

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

Casey M Alexander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHNECK, JOEL S

Attorney at Schachter Portnoy, L.L.C.

FAYE, CRAIG

Attorney at SCHACHTER PORTNOY LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

AFFIRMATION AFF OF NON-MIL

AFFIRMATION AFF OF NON-MIL; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT BY DEBT BUYER

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT BY DEBT BUYER; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT CASEY M ALEXANDER

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT CASEY M ALEXANDER; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFF OF NON-MIL; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT BY DEBT BUYER; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT; Filed By: Schneck, J.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT CASEY M ALEXANDER; Filed By: Faye, C. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less