This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/30/2020 at 11:17:12 (UTC).

Cathy Waddington v. Erin Carutis et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 Cathy Waddington filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Erin Carutis. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1792

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cathy Waddington

Defendants

Mitchell Carutis

Erin Carutis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODEAS, HARRY GEORGE

Attorney at LOSI & GANGI

Defendant Attorney

ARCHILLA, DANIEL RICHARD

Attorney at BUFFALO STAFF COUNSEL MANAGING ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: OTHER assignment of Judge

RJI -RE: OTHER assignment of Judge; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE (Motion #1ER) Stipulated Order

ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE (Motion #1ER) Stipulated Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1ER)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1ER); Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Demand to Change Venue

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Demand to Change Venue; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint, Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint, Answer; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) police report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) police report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Modeas, H.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Modeas, H.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Modeas, H.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER assignment of Judge; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE (Motion #1ER) Stipulated Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1ER); Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1ER) Demand to Change Venue; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1ER) Summons, Complaint, Answer; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1ER) police report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1ER); Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1ER); Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Modeas, H.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY) Original document type was RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Modeas, H.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Modeas, H.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less