Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 03:57:14 (UTC).

Catherine J Tills et al v. Stephen Joseph Gregoritch MD,PhD et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 Catherine J Tills filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Stephen Joseph Gregoritch MD,PhD. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick J Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frederick J Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Catherine J Tills

Robert Tills

Defendants

Southtowns Radiation Oncology

Stephen Joseph Gregoritch MD,PHD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REGAN, LAWRENCE J.

Attorney at Regan & Regan

FAY, JENNIFER LYNN

Attorney at Faraci Lange, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SWEET, KATHLEEN MARIE

Attorney at GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

GRABOWSKI, MELINDA LEA

Attorney at GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY, LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Fay, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE with attachments

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE with attachments; Filed By: Fay, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Fay, J.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Regan, L.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Regan, L.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Regan, L.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Regan, L.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Fay, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE with attachments; Filed By: Fay, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Fay, J.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Regan, L.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Regan, L.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Regan, L.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Regan, L.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less