This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 15:23:10 (UTC).

Catherine Ayala - v. - City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 Catherine Ayala filed an Other lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Ayala

Defendants

John Doe

Michael Seiger

New York City Police Department

City of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FEINBERG, MARK EDWARD

RASKIN, RAYMOND ALAN

Attorney at RAYMOND A RASKIN ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

MOSS, JESSICA ANNE

Attorney at New York City Law Department

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

ORDER - OTHER dated 1/15/19

ORDER - OTHER dated 1/15/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/14/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 11/20/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 11/20/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 01/17/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Raskin, R.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

ANSWER (AMENDED)

ANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Moss, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Discovery Demand

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Discovery Demand; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of Process on P.O. Seiger

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of Process on P.O. Seiger; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on NYPD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on NYPD; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on City

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on City; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 1/15/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/14/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Raskin, R.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 11/20/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Moss, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Discovery Demand; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of Process on P.O. Seiger; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on NYPD; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on City; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Feinberg, M.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less