This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 14:00:04 (UTC).

Cassandra Nelson - v. - Suzanne Dennis et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 Cassandra Nelson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Suzanne Dennis. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0111

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cassandra Nelson

Defendants

Suzanne Dennis

Hudson Heights Apartments

Roger Dennis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD, JAMES DAVID

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES D. WARD

Defendant Attorneys

GROSSO, JAMES CHARLES

Attorney at James C. Grosso, Esq.

FATCHERIC, MAUREEN G.

Attorney at Costello Law Firm

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Fatcheric, M.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Fatcheric, M.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ward, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Grosso, J.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS WITH NOTICE & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS WITH NOTICE & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ward, J.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Fatcheric, M.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Fatcheric, M.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ward, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Grosso, J.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS WITH NOTICE & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ward, J.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less