This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/15/2020 at 14:25:18 (UTC).

Casimiro Cuevas et al - v. - Technology Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 Casimiro Cuevas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Technology Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2715

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Casimiro Cuevas

Zenaida Jiminez

Defendants

Terry Loftin II

Technology Solutions, Inc.

Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIEMELIS, HUGH SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

GOLISANO, BRENT STEPHEN

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas K. Moore

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Fully executed Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Fully executed Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ziemelis, H.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Ziemelis, H.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Preliminary Conference Stipulation/Order

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Preliminary Conference Stipulation/Order; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/10/2018

ANSWER (AMENDED)

ANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 04/09/2018; Received: 04/09/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 04/09/2018; Received: 04/09/2018

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ziemelis, H.; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Demand for Complaint

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Ziemelis, H.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Fully executed Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ziemelis, H.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Ziemelis, H.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Preliminary Conference Stipulation/Order; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 04/09/2018; Received: 04/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 04/09/2018; Received: 04/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Ziemelis, H.; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Golisano, B.; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Ziemelis, H.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less