This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 14:19:47 (UTC).

CASELLA CONSTRUCTION CORP. v. GRA-DER GENERAL CONTRACTING CORP.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 CASELLA CONSTRUCTION CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GRA-DER GENERAL CONTRACTING CORP. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Bruno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Bruno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASELLA CONSTRUCTION CORP.

Defendant

GRA-DER GENERAL CONTRACTING CORP.

Not Yet Classified

Mitchell Elman LAW OFFICES OF MITCHELL C. ELMAN, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DWORKEN, CORY SCOTT

Attorney at ALTSCHUI & ALTSCHUI

ALTSCHUL, MARK M

Attorney at ALTSCHUL & ALTSCHUL

Not Yet Classified Attorney

ELMAN, MITCHELL C.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MITCHELL C. ELMAN, PC

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note Of Issue

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note Of Issue; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) RJI

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) RJI; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Letter; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Demand For Interrogatories

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Demand For Interrogatories; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Compl

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Compl; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001) Affidavit Of Facts

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001) Affidavit Of Facts; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice Of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice Of Motion; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

INTERROGATORIES Responses to Plaintiff's First

INTERROGATORIES Responses to Plaintiff's First; Filed By: Elman, M.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice Discovery & Inspection

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

INTERROGATORIES Interrogatories

INTERROGATORIES Interrogatories; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Altschul, M.; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Altschul, M.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note Of Issue; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note Of Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) RJI; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Letter; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice Of Motion; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Elman, M.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES Responses to Plaintiff's First; Filed By: Elman, M.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stip to Discontinue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES Interrogatories; Filed By: Dworken, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Elman, M.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Altschul, M.; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Altschul, M.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less