This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 07/25/2023 at 08:25:49 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. DANIEL ONEILL

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANIEL ONEILL. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Daniel Oneill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1291326

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1291326; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1291326

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1291326; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291326

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291326; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1388782

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1388782; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291326

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291326; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291326; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1388782; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291326; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1291326; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1291326; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less