This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 10/01/2023 at 06:08:50 (UTC).

Discover Bank v. John R Cooke

Case Summary

On 06/22/2023 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against John R Cooke. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2023

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

John R Cooke

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOISELLE, ANNA L.

WEINER, DAVID VICTOR

Defendant Attorney

BAGGAN, KRISTI-ANN KYNA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT John R Cooke

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT John R Cooke; Filed By: Weiner, D. - filed by ABC LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2023; Received: 06/22/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - A Credit Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Credit Statement; Filed By: Weiner, D. - filed by ABC LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2023; Received: 06/22/2023

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Weiner, D. - filed by ABC LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2023; Received: 06/22/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weiner, D. - filed by ABC LEGAL; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Baggan, K.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2023; Received: 07/19/2023

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2023; Received: 07/24/2023

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/05/2023; Received: 09/05/2023

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/05/2023; Received: 09/05/2023

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/05/2023; Received: 09/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/05/2023; Received: 09/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2023; Received: 07/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2023; Received: 07/19/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Baggan, K.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weiner, D. - filed by ABC LEGAL; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Weiner, D. - filed by ABC LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2023; Received: 06/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Credit Statement; Filed By: Weiner, D. - filed by ABC LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2023; Received: 06/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT John R Cooke; Filed By: Weiner, D. - filed by ABC LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2023; Received: 06/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less