This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 09/21/2023 at 18:37:55 (UTC).

Joel Russell v. Carthage Central School District

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 Joel Russell filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Carthage Central School District. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0134

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joel Russell

Defendant

Carthage Central School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUATTROCCI, ROBERT ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY, THOMAS JOHN

O'CONNOR, GERARD EDWARD

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 01/11/2023; Received: 01/11/2023

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 03/28/2023; Received: 03/28/2023

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Murphy, T.; Filed: 05/03/2023; Received: 05/03/2023

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Murphy, T.; Filed: 05/03/2023; Received: 05/03/2023

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: O'Connor, G.; Filed: 06/26/2023; Received: 06/26/2023

 

Docket Entries

06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: O'Connor, G.; Filed: 06/26/2023; Received: 06/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Murphy, T.; Filed: 05/03/2023; Received: 05/03/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Murphy, T.; Filed: 05/03/2023; Received: 05/03/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 03/28/2023; Received: 03/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 01/11/2023; Received: 01/11/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less