This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 09/29/2023 at 20:42:46 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. v. JESSICA M GOEMAN

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESSICA M GOEMAN. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1874

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

Jessica M Goeman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUGHES, ADAM MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 05/05/2023; Received: 05/05/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/30/2023; Received: 05/30/2023

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/30/2023; Received: 05/30/2023

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/02/2023; Received: 06/02/2023

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

 

Docket Entries

08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/22/2023; Received: 08/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/02/2023; Received: 06/02/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/30/2023; Received: 05/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/30/2023; Received: 05/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 05/05/2023; Received: 05/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less