This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 07/19/2023 at 07:20:10 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC v. Helene Reda

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Helene Reda. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

Helene Reda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

 

Docket Entries

03/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2019
View Court Documents

Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less