This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 07/29/2023 at 18:37:09 (UTC).

Alan Russo v. The City of Watertown

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Alan Russo filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The City of Watertown. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is William Ramseier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1735

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

William Ramseier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alan Russo

Defendant

The City of Watertown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

STONE, CHRISTINA E.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/19/2023; Received: 07/19/2023

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Notice to Plaintiff

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Notice to Plaintiff; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) December 13, 2019 letter to Plaintiff

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) December 13, 2019 letter to Plaintiff; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Letter to Plaintiff January 26, 2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Letter to Plaintiff January 26, 2017; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Shawn McWayne

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Shawn McWayne; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Photographs

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Photographs; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Michael Delaney

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Michael Delaney; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Statement of Amounts Due

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Statement of Amounts Due; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 11/12/2020; Received: 11/12/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Stone, C. - filed by Slye Law Offices, P.C.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Stone, C. - filed by Slye Law Offices, P.C.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service of Watertown City Clerk

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service of Watertown City Clerk; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/21/2020; Received: 10/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D home rule law

EXHIBIT(S) - D home rule law; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C notice of hearing date

EXHIBIT(S) - C notice of hearing date; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B warrant application

EXHIBIT(S) - B warrant application; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Proof of claim

EXHIBIT(S) - A Proof of claim; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/19/2023; Received: 07/19/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Notice to Plaintiff; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) December 13, 2019 letter to Plaintiff; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Letter to Plaintiff January 26, 2017; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Shawn McWayne; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Photographs; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Michael Delaney; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Statement of Amounts Due; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of James Mills; Filed By: Stone, C.; Filed: 07/05/2023; Received: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
11/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A proof of claim; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 11/12/2020; Received: 11/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 11/12/2020; Received: 11/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Stone, C. - filed by Law Office of Christina E. Stone; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Stone, C. - filed by Law Office of Christina E. Stone; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service of Watertown City Clerk; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/21/2020; Received: 10/21/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D home rule law; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C notice of hearing date; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B warrant application; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Proof of claim; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Antonucci, D.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less