This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 09/23/2019 at 12:49:23 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2005-OPT4, ASSET BACKED PASS- THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-OPT4 - v. - THOMAS J. DOOLEY et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2005-OPT4, ASSET BACKED PASS- THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-OPT4 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THOMAS J DOOLEY. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor G Grossman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Victor G Grossman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2005-OPT4, ASSET BACKED PASS- THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-OPT4

Defendants

Patricia M. Dooley A/K/A PATRICIA DOOLEY

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

John doe one Through John doe twelve the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Su

Thomas J. Dooley A/K/A THOMAS DOOLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPOSATO, MELISSA A.

Defendant Attorney

PANCOTTI, DANIEL GUY

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #2)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B - Filed Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B - Filed Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Filed affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Filed affidavit of service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affidavit or Affirmation in Support of Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affidavit or Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Order Proposed

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Order Proposed; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pancotti, D.; Filed: 11/15/2018; Received: 11/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service and back page

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service and back page; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F SCH A

EXHIBIT(S) - F SCH A; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E certificate of merit

EXHIBIT(S) - E certificate of merit; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D notice

EXHIBIT(S) - D notice; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C JUDGMENTS CREDITS

EXHIBIT(S) - C JUDGMENTS CREDITS; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A note

EXHIBIT(S) - A note; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

COMPLAINT *Corrected* complaint

COMPLAINT *Corrected* complaint; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* summons

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* summons; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B - Filed Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Filed affidavit of service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affidavit or Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Order Proposed; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pancotti, D.; Filed: 11/15/2018; Received: 11/15/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service and back page; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #1) E-Courts Foreclosure Settlement Form; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
01/23/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS THOMAS DOOLEY; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/23/2018; Received: 01/23/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F SCH A; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E certificate of merit; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D notice; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C JUDGMENTS CREDITS; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A note; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT *Corrected* complaint; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* summons; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less