Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 16:54:17 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL, LLC - v. - ERIC W STEWART

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 CASCADE CAPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ERIC W STEWART. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********41CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC

Defendant

Eric W Stewart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

AFFIRMATION Statue of Limitations Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Statue of Limitations Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

AFFIRMATION Non Military Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Non Military Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AA11051382329 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AA11051382329 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Statue of Limitations Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non Military Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT AA11051382329 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less