This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 17:00:04 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL, LLC - v. - CHARLENE TOMPKINS

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 CASCADE CAPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHARLENE TOMPKINS. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC

Defendant

Charlene Tompkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ANSWER/CHARLENE (TOMPKINS) HARDING

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ANSWER/CHARLENE (TOMPKINS) HARDING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 07/02/2018

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 07/02/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AA11051364787 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AA11051364787 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ANSWER/CHARLENE (TOMPKINS) HARDING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 07/02/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT AA11051364787 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less