This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:30:47 (UTC).

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC - v. - ROSANNE FLEETWOOD et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROSANNE FLEETWOOD. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1071

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

Rosanne Fleetwood

John Does AND JANE DOES, SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, PARTIES INTENDED BEING POSSIBLE TENANTS OR OCCUPANTS OF PREMISES, AND CORPORATIONS, OTHER ENTITIES OR PERSONS WHO CLAIM, OR MAY CLAIM, A LIEN AGAINST THE PREMISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIERER, CYNTHIA ANNE

Attorney at The Margolin & Weinreb Law Group, LLP

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #03)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #03); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #03) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR SUB REF ORDER

EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #03) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR SUB REF ORDER; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSANNE FLEETWOOD 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSANNE FLEETWOOD 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSANNE FLEETWOOD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSANNE FLEETWOOD; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #03); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #03) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR SUB REF ORDER; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Mandatory Foreclosure Conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSANNE FLEETWOOD 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSANNE FLEETWOOD; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less