This case was last updated from Monroe County New York Courts on 11/18/2021 at 09:52:28 (UTC).

CAROLE COOPER v. COMPANION CARE OF ROCHESTER, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 CAROLE COOPER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against COMPANION CARE OF ROCHESTER, INC. This case was filed in Monroe County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1192

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carole Cooper as Administrator of the Estate of MURIEL SQUIRRELL

Defendants

Maggie Johnston

COMPANION CARE OF ROCHESTER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERRICK, KRISTIN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 02/09/2021; Received: 02/09/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 02/09/2021; Received: 02/09/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service (COMPANION CARE OF ROCHESTER, INC.)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service (COMPANION CARE OF ROCHESTER, INC.); Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service (Companion Care of Rochester, Inc. and Maggie Johnston)

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service (Companion Care of Rochester, Inc. and Maggie Johnston); Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service (Companion Care of Rochester, Inc. through the New York Secretary of State)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service (Companion Care of Rochester, Inc. through the New York Secretary of State); Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 03/24/2021; Received: 03/24/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service (Companion Care of Rochester, Inc. through the New York Secretary of State); Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 03/24/2021; Received: 03/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service (Companion Care of Rochester, Inc. and Maggie Johnston); Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service (COMPANION CARE OF ROCHESTER, INC.); Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 02/09/2021; Received: 02/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Merrick, K.; Filed: 02/09/2021; Received: 02/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less