This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 18:10:06 (UTC).

Carol Marsch - v. - Niagara County et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 Carol Marsch filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol Marsch

Defendants

Niagara County

Cintas Corporation No. 2

Cintas d/b/a Cintas Corporation No. 2

Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.

Cintas Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, WILLIAM PATRICK

Attorney at LIPSITZ GREEN SCIME CAMBRIA, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LONG, WILLIAM A.

Attorney at THE LONG FIRM LLP

DRURY, THOMAS J

Attorney at DAMON & MOREY, LLP

DRURY, THOMAS J.

SACCOMANDO, VINCENT GEORGE

Attorney at BARCLAY DAMON, LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer of Cintas Defendants

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer of Cintas Defendants; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) Discovery

RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) Discovery; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Letter dated 12/17/17

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Letter dated 12/17/17; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Supplemental Demand for Relief

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Supplemental Demand for Relief; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Medicare/Medicaid Request

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Medicare/Medicaid Request; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Omnibus Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Omnibus Demands; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Demand for VBOP

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Demand for VBOP; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) S&C

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) S&C Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Long, W.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Drury, T.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas Corporation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas Corporation; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas Corporation No. 2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas Corporation No. 2; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas d/b/a Cintas Corporation No. 2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas d/b/a Cintas Corporation No. 2; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Niagara County

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Niagara County; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer of Cintas Defendants; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) Discovery; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Letter dated 12/17/17; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Supplemental Demand for Relief; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Medicare/Medicaid Request; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Omnibus Demands; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Demand for VBOP; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) S&C Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Saccomando, V.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Long, W.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Long, W.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Drury, T.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas Corporation; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas Corporation No. 2; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Cintas d/b/a Cintas Corporation No. 2; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Niagara County; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less