Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 02:38:31 (UTC).

CAROL DAVIS et al v. PETER DAVIS et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 CAROL DAVIS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PETER DAVIS. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly O'Neill Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly O'Neill Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carol Davis

Bernard Davis

Defendants

Peter Davis

Anastasia natasha Augoustopoulos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TALLBE, ALICIA A.

Attorney at Yankwitt LLP

Yankwitt, Russell

Attorney at YANKWITT LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Zeiderman, Lisa

Attorney at Miller Zeiderman & Wiederkehr LLP

DE GIORGIO, DINA M.

Attorney at DINA M. DE GIORGIO, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER

This Decision/Order concerns the OSC to dismiss this action. The motion to dismiss was filed as mot. seq. 004 under 311836/17 (related matrimonial action Davis v. Davis), which was consolidated with this matter per 12/2/19 so-ordered stipulation.

NOTICE OF APPEAL

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

COVID 19 Emergency Filing Cover Sheet

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Opposition Papers and Memorandum of Law in Motion to Re-reconsider

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Motion to Reargue

NOTICE OF FILING DURING THE COVID-19 PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY

--none--

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Defendants reply, dated January 27, 2020

EXHIBIT(S)

Plaintiffs opposition, dated January 9, 2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: De Giorgio, D.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

ANSWER Verified Answer from Defendant Peter Davis (1.6.20)

ANSWER Verified Answer from Defendant Peter Davis (1.6.20); Filed By: Zeiderman, L.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Yankwitt, R.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER This Decision/Order concerns the OSC to dismiss this action. The motion to dismiss was filed as mot. seq. 004 under 311836/17 (related matrimonial action Davis v. Davis), which was consolidated with this matter per 12/2/19 so-ordered stipulation.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 05/07/2020; Received: 05/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) COVID 19 Emergency Filing Cover Sheet; Filed By: De Giorgio, D.; Filed: 04/29/2020; Received: 04/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Opposition Papers and Memorandum of Law in Motion to Re-reconsider; Filed By: De Giorgio, D.; Filed: 04/29/2020; Received: 04/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Motion to Reargue; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 04/28/2020; Received: 04/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DURING THE COVID-19 PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY (Motion #001); Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 04/28/2020; Received: 04/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Defendants reply, dated January 27, 2020; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiffs opposition, dated January 9, 2020; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Defendant's Order to Show Cause, dated December 2, 2019; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Anastasia's MTD consolidated with Index No. 311836/2017; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: De Giorgio, D.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer from Defendant Peter Davis (1.6.20); Filed By: Zeiderman, L.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Tallbe, A.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Yankwitt, R.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less