This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:13:18 (UTC).

CARETECH GROUP, LLC - v. - RUBY CARE LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 CARETECH GROUP, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against RUBY CARE LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Sylvia G. Ash, Comm 11. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Sylvia G. Ash, Comm 11

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARETECH GROUP, LLC

Defendants

RECEIVER SERVICES LLC d/b/a HARBOUR HEALTH MULTICARE CENTER FOR LIVING

PRESBYTERIAN CARE OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC. d/b/a HARBOUR HEALTH MULTICARE CENTER FOR LIVING

RUBY CARE LLC d/b/a EMERALD NORTH NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CONDON, BRIAN K

Attorney at CONDON & MARA, PLLC

MARA, AMY MICHELLE

Attorney at Condon & Mara, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

NEWMAN, EVAN M

Attorney at Jacobowitz Newman Tversky LLP

BEINHORN, ABRAHAM S.

Attorney at Jacobowitz Newman Tversky LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Beinhorn, A.; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/18/2018

JUDGMENT *Corrected*

JUDGMENT *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Mara, A.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1)

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Attorney's Affirmation of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Attorney's Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Mara, A.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 2013 Invoices

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 2013 Invoices; Filed By: Mara, A.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Newman, E.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Newman, E.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D Invoices

EXHIBIT(S) - D Invoices; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C September 28, 2016 Demand Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - C September 28, 2016 Demand Letter; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Software Lease Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Software Lease Agreement; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Service Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Service Agreement; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Beinhorn, A.; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Mara, A.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Attorney's Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Mara, A.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 2013 Invoices; Filed By: Mara, A.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affidavit in Opposition; Filed By: Mara, A.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Mara, A.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Newman, E.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Newman, E.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Invoices; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C September 28, 2016 Demand Letter; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Software Lease Agreement; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Service Agreement; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Condon, B.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less