This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 17:10:50 (UTC).

Cara Brozenich v. Michael A. Vaccaro et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Cara Brozenich filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Michael A Vaccaro. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cara Brozenich

Defendants

Michael A. Vaccaro

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLOSE, PETER

Attorney at Klose & Associates, P.C. (Peter Klose, Esq.)

Defendant Attorney

TISCHLER, PERRY I

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PERRY I. TISCHLER

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR

ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter RE: Failure to Comply with Discovery

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter RE: Failure to Comply with Discovery; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

ORDER - REFERENCE ORDER - REFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 26, 2019

ORDER - REFERENCE ORDER - REFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 26, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 26, 2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 26, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Preliminary Conference Order-

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Preliminary Conference Order-; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Preliminary Conference Part

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Preliminary Conference Part; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI -Request for Preliminary Conference

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI -Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference-RJI

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference-RJI; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Couner-Claims with Aff. of Service

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Couner-Claims with Aff. of Service; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Complete (2-1-19)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Complete (2-1-19); Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Deed to Subject Property

EXHIBIT(S) - A Deed to Subject Property; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint (Partition)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint (Partition); Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter RE: Failure to Comply with Discovery; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE ORDER - REFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 26, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 26, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Preliminary Conference Order-; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Preliminary Conference Part; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI -Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference-RJI; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Couner-Claims with Aff. of Service; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Complete (2-1-19); Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Deed to Subject Property; Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint (Partition); Filed By: Klose, P.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less