This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 05/07/2020 at 01:52:34 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. - v. - WENDY A SIMMONS PARKER

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WENDY A SIMMONS PARKER. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1819

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A

Defendant

Wendy A Simmons parker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUGHES, ADAM MICHAEL

Attorney at MALEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

ARRICK, DANA MARIE

Attorney at MCDONNELL, ADELS & KLESTZICK, PLLC.

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arrick, D. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Arrick, D. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Arrick, D. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arrick, D. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Arrick, D. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Arrick, D. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less