This case was last updated from Essex County New York Courts on 11/22/2021 at 00:29:10 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. STEPHEN R SANDBERG

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEPHEN R SANDBERG. This case was filed in Essex County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0151

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Stephen R Sandberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/11/2021; Received: 05/11/2021

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/22/2021; Received: 06/22/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/22/2021; Received: 06/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/11/2021; Received: 05/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less