This case was last updated from Essex County New York Courts on 11/22/2021 at 19:20:21 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. SCOTT J TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCOTT J TAYLOR. This case was filed in Essex County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0168

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Scott J Taylor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1375070

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 04/08/2021; Received: 04/08/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2021; Received: 06/29/2021

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1375070

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1375070

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1375070

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1375070

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1375070

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/27/2021; Received: 07/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2021; Received: 06/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1375070; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 04/08/2021; Received: 04/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less