This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 16:30:27 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. RUTH AQUINO RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against RUTH AQUINO RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Ruth Aquino Ramirez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1284170

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1284170

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1284170

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT R&R FILE # 1284170

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1284170

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1284170

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1284170; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less