This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 16:03:18 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. REBECCA L LACEY

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REBECCA L LACEY. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0208

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N A

Defendant

Rebecca L Lacey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291464

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291464

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291464

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1291464

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1291464

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1291464

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1291464; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less