Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 22:39:19 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. MATTHEW J WHEATLEY

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATTHEW J WHEATLEY. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

Matthew J Wheatley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1305983

AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1305983

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1305983

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1305983

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1305983

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 10/11/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 10/11/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1305983

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/30/2019; Received: 08/30/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 10/11/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1305983; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/30/2019; Received: 08/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less