Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 17:45:35 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. MARY DUNKIN

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARY DUNKIN. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Mary Dunkin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less