Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 14:05:07 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. MANISHA PRASAI

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANISHA PRASAI. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

Manisha Prasai

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUGHES, ADAM MICHAEL

Attorney at MALEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 12/26/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 12/26/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 12/26/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less