This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 12:44:08 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. - v. - LYNDON SANDY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LYNDON SANDY. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Lyndon Sandy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS

EXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 12/18/2017

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 12/18/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 12/18/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less