Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 17:21:48 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. - v. - LYDIA T KATABAZI

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LYDIA T KATABAZI. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

Lydia T Katabazi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

JUDGMENT Entered by Clerk

JUDGMENT Entered by Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT Entered by Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less