Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 12:39:51 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. LILLIAN A BRUST

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LILLIAN A BRUST. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Lillian A Brust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

Defendant Attorney

RESNICK, JOSHUA COLIN

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert S. Gitmeid & Assoc., PLLC

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Resnick, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE R&R FILE# 1300652

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE R&R FILE# 1300652; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Billing Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Billing Statement; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redaction Page

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redaction Page; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1300652

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1300652; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Resnick, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE R&R FILE# 1300652; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Billing Statement; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redaction Page; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1300652; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less