This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 12:59:21 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. LAURA ARREGUIN

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LAURA ARREGUIN. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Laura Arreguin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUGHES, ADAM MICHAEL

Attorney at MALEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Smilowitz, B.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Smilowitz, B.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Smilowitz, B.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Smilowitz, B.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Smilowitz, B.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Smilowitz, B.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Smilowitz, B.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Smilowitz, B.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less