This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 20:41:13 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. - v. - KYOUNG J LEE

Case Summary

On 05/06/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against KYOUNG J LEE. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1961

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Kyoung J Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/06/2017; Received: 05/06/2017

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/06/2017; Received: 05/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less