This case was last updated from St. Lawrence County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 00:29:20 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. JEFFREY A DISHAW

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEFFREY A DISHAW. This case was filed in St. Lawrence County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********4918

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Lawrence, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

One bank Na Capital

Defendant

Jeffrey A Dishaw

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUGHES, ADAM MICHAEL

Attorney at MALEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

HUGHES, ADAM M

Attorney at MALEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by North American Process, LLC; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by North American Process, LLC; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by North American Process, LLC; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by North American Process, LLC; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by North American Process, LLC; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by North American Process, LLC; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less