Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 03/14/2020 at 23:04:27 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. JAMIE E BALLING

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMIE E BALLING. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Jamie E Balling

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B CLIENT STATEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - B CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY AFF

EXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY AFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY AFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less